FL S0050 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-20 - Chapter No. 2021-2
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-20 - Chapter No. 2021-2
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Citing this act as the "Park Randall 'Randy' Miller Act"; revising the definition of the term "retail sale" to include sales facilitated through a marketplace; requiring marketplace providers and persons located outside of this state to remit discretionary sales surtax when delivering tangible personal property to a county imposing a surtax; providing that a marketplace seller, rather than the marketplace provider, is liable for sales tax collection and remittance under certain circumstances; requiring certain amounts to be deposited into the Unemployment Compensation Trust Fund during specified periods, etc.
Title
Taxation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#17 (Y: 27 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#16 (Y: 17 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-08 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#67 (Y: 93 N: 24 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#14 (Y: 30 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#13 (Y: 24 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate Appropriations (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate Finance and Tax (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Tourism (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#16 (Y: 17 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-08 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#67 (Y: 93 N: 24 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#14 (Y: 30 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#13 (Y: 24 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate Appropriations (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate Finance and Tax (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Tourism (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-20 | Chapter No. 2021-2 | |
2021-04-19 | Approved by Governor | |
2021-04-12 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Ordered engrossed, then enrolled |
2021-04-08 | Senate | CS passed as amended; YEAS 27 NAYS 12 |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Concurred in 1 amendment(s) (642177) |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Amendment(s) to House amendment(s) failed (345744) |
2021-04-08 | Senate | In returning messages |
2021-04-08 | House | Message sent to senate |
2021-04-08 | House | Immediately certified |
2021-04-08 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 93, NAYS 24 |
2021-04-08 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-07 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2021-04-07 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2021-04-07 | House | Amendment 685263 ruled out of order |
2021-04-07 | House | Amendment 755649 ruled out of order |
2021-04-07 | House | Amendment 642177 adopted |
2021-04-07 | House | Amendment 073047 Failed |
2021-04-07 | House | Amendment 596577 Failed |
2021-04-07 | House | Amendment 441071 withdrawn |
2021-04-07 | House | Amendment 952659 Failed |
2021-04-07 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-07 | House | Substituted for CS/CS/HB 15 |
2021-04-02 | House | Amendment 073047 filed |
2021-04-02 | House | Amendment 441071 filed |
2021-04-02 | House | Amendment 596577 filed |
2021-04-02 | House | Amendment 685263 filed |
2021-04-02 | House | Amendment 952659 filed |
2021-04-02 | House | Amendment 755649 filed |
2021-04-02 | House | Amendment 642177 filed |
2021-04-01 | House | 1st Reading (Engrossed 1) |
2021-04-01 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/7/2021) |
2021-04-01 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2021-03-25 | House | In Messages |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Immediately certified |
2021-03-25 | Senate | CS passed as amended; YEAS 30 NAYS 10 |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (913612) |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Retained on Special Order Calendar |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Retained on Special Order Calendar |
2021-03-10 | Senate | CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/11/21 |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2021-03-04 | Senate | CS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 |
2021-03-02 | Senate | CS by Finance and Tax read 1st time |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-03-01 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 03/04/21, 11:30 am, 412 Knott Building |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2021-02-18 | Senate | CS by Finance and Tax; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2021-02-08 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Finance and Tax, 02/18/21, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Building |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Now in Finance and Tax |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Favorable by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2021-01-15 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 01/25/21, 2:30 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2020-12-21 | Senate | Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Finance and Tax; Appropriations |
2020-12-18 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H15 (Similar To) 2021-04-07 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 50 (Ch. 2021-2)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
212 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 031 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 0506 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 054 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 055 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 0596 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 05965 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 11 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 12 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 18 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 20 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
213 | 015 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
213 | 27 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
443 | 1216 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
443 | 131 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
443 | 191 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |