FL H0015 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-07 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 50 (Ch. 2021-2)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-07 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 50 (Ch. 2021-2)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires marketplace providers & persons located outside FL to remit discretionary sales surtax; replaces taxation of mail order sales with taxation of remote sales; provides entities making remote sales are dealers for sales & use taxes; requires entities to collect & remit additional fees at time of sale; authorizes marketplace providers & sellers to agree for marketplace sellers to collect taxes & fees; provides relief to persons for liability for tax, penalty, & interest due on remote sales; provides alternative method to calculate unemployment contribution in specified years; provides for deposit of funds in Unemployment Compensation Trust Fund.
Title
Taxation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-29 - House - House Commerce Committee (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - House Ways & Means Committee (Y: 16 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - House Ways & Means Committee (Y: 16 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-07 | House | Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 50 (Ch. 2021-2) |
2021-04-07 | House | Substituted CS/CS/SB 50 |
2021-04-01 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/7/2021) |
2021-04-01 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2021-04-01 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2021-03-30 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2) |
2021-03-30 | House | CS Filed |
2021-03-30 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2021-03-30 | House | Reported out of Commerce Committee |
2021-03-29 | House | Favorable with CS by Commerce Committee |
2021-03-25 | House | PCS added to Commerce Committee agenda |
2021-03-21 | House | Now in Commerce Committee |
2021-03-21 | House | Referred to Commerce Committee |
2021-03-16 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2021-03-15 | House | CS Filed |
2021-03-15 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2021-03-15 | House | Reported out of Ways & Means Committee |
2021-03-11 | House | Favorable with CS by Ways & Means Committee |
2021-03-09 | House | Added to Ways & Means Committee agenda |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-01-15 | House | Referred to Ways and Means Committee; Commerce Committee |
2020-11-30 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S50 (Similar To) 2021-04-20 - Chapter No. 2021-2
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
212 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 031 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 0506 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 054 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 055 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 0596 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 05965 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 11 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 12 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 18 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 20 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
213 | 015 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
213 | 27 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
443 | 1216 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
443 | 131 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
443 | 191 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |