FL H8025 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 4 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-13 - Adopted by Publication
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 4 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-13 - Adopted by Publication
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizes March 2023, as "Kidney Disease Awareness Month" & March 9, 2023, as "World Kidney Day" in Florida.
Title
Kidney Disease Awareness Month and World Kidney Day
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-13 | House | Adopted by Publication |
2023-04-13 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-04-13 | House | Placed on Ceremonial Resolutions Calendar - Publication only |
2023-04-04 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2023-04-04 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1742 (Similar To) 2023-05-05 - Died, not introduced, companion bill(s) passed, see HR 8025 (Adopted)
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/8025 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/8025/BillText/Filed/PDF |