FL H8005 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-22 - Adopted by Publication
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-22 - Adopted by Publication
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Designates January 28, 2020, as "Florida Gulf Coast University Day" in Florida.
Title
Florida Gulf Coast University Day
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-22 | House | Adopted by Publication |
2020-01-22 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-01-22 | House | Placed on Ceremonial Resolutions Calendar - Publication only |
2020-01-21 | House | Introduced |
2020-01-21 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1892 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died, not introduced
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/8005 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/8005/BillText/Filed/PDF |