FL H7065 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-3-1)
Status: Passed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Chapter No. 2019-57
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Providing requirements and limitations for property insurance assignment agreements; providing a burden of proof; providing that an assignment agreement does not affect managed repair arrangements under a property insurance policy; providing that an acceptance by an assignee of an assignment agreement is a waiver by the assignee and its subcontractors of certain claims against an insured; specifying an insured's payment obligations under an assignment agreement; requiring notice of intent to initiate litigation, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Insurance Assignment Agreements

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#14 (Y: 25 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#11 (Y: 17 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-04-11 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#85 (Y: 96 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-23 Chapter No. 2019-57
2019-05-23 Approved by Governor
2019-05-22 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2019-04-24HouseOrdered enrolled
2019-04-24SenateCS passed; YEAS 25 NAYS 14
2019-04-24SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-23SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-04-23SenateAmendment(s) failed (663344)
2019-04-23SenateRead 2nd time
2019-04-23SenateSubstituted for CS/CS/CS/SB 122
2019-04-23SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2019-04-23SenateWithdrawn from Banking and Insurance; Judiciary; Rules
2019-04-22SenateReceived
2019-04-18SenateReferred to Banking and Insurance; Judiciary; Rules
2019-04-18SenateIn Messages
2019-04-11HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 96 NAYS 20
2019-04-11HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-10HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-04-10HouseAmendment(s) adopted (437797, 738325) 619
2019-04-10HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-04HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/10/19
2019-04-01HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-04-01HouseCS/CS by Judiciary Committee read 1st time
2019-03-29HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-03-28HouseCS/CS by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 14 NAYS 3
2019-03-26HouseOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 03/28/19, 8:00 am, Sumner Hall
2019-03-22HouseNow in Judiciary Committee
2019-03-21HouseCS by Insurance and Banking Subcommittee read 1st time
2019-03-21HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-03-19HouseCS by Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 1
2019-03-15HouseOn Committee agenda-- Insurance and Banking Subcommittee, 03/19/19, 3:30 pm, Sumner Hall
2019-03-13HouseIntroduced
2019-03-13HouseReferred to Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee
2019-03-12HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

H359 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee
H489 (Similar To) 2019-01-30 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
S904 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Banking and Insurance
S122 (Same As) 2019-04-23 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 7065

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
627422Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6277152Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6277153Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6277288Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6277289Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7065
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7065/BillText/Filed/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7065/BillText/c1/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7065/BillText/c2/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7065/BillText/e1/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7065/BillText/er/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7065/Amendment/371491/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7065/Amendment/676533/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7065/Amendment/227223/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7065/Amendment/437797/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7065/Amendment/738325/PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7065/Vote/HouseVote_h07065e1085.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7065/Vote/SenateVote_h07065e1011.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7065/Vote/SenateVote_h07065e1014.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback