FL S0122 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on December 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-23 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7065 (Ch. 2019-57)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Providing requirements and limitations for property insurance assignment agreements; providing that an acceptance by an assignee of an assignment agreement is a waiver by the assignee and its subcontractors of certain claims against an insured; authorizing insurers to make available property insurance policies restricting the assignment of post-loss benefits under certain conditions; providing that residential or commercial property insurance policies may not prohibit the assignment of post-lost benefits, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Insurance Assignment Agreements

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-23SenateLaid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7065 (Ch. 2019-57)
2019-04-23SenateSubstituted CS/CS/HB 7065
2019-04-23SenateRead 2nd time
2019-04-22SenateCS/CS/CS by Rules read 1st time
2019-04-18SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/23/19
2019-04-18SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2019-04-18SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-04-17SenateCS/CS/CS by- Rules; YEAS 11 NAYS 6
2019-04-12SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/17/19, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
2019-03-21SenateCS/CS by Judiciary read 1st time
2019-03-20SenateNow in Rules
2019-03-20SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-03-18SenateCS/CS by Judiciary; YEAS 5 NAYS 1
2019-03-13SenateOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 03/18/19, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
2019-03-07SenateCS by Banking and Insurance read 1st time
2019-03-07SenateNow in Judiciary
2019-03-06SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-03-04SenateCS by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 5 NAYS 3
2019-02-25SenateOn Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 03/04/19, 3:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
2019-02-11SenateOn Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 02/11/19, 4:30 pm, 412 Knott Building --Temporarily Postponed
2019-01-28SenateOn Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 02/04/19, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building --Discussed/Workshop
2019-01-22SenateOn Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 01/22/19, 12:30 pm, 412 Knott Building --Discussed/Workshop
2019-01-10SenateReferred to Banking and Insurance; Judiciary; Rules
2018-12-03SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H301 (Similar To) 2019-06-18 - Chapter No. 2019-108
H1247 (Similar To) 2019-06-10 - Chapter No. 2019-94
H7065 (Same As) 2019-05-23 - Chapter No. 2019-57
H359 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7065 (Ch. 2019-57)
H489 (Similar To) 2019-01-30 - Withdrawn prior to introduction, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7065 (Ch. 2019-57)
S904 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Banking and Insurance, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7065 (Ch. 2019-57)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
501172Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6269373Amended CodeSee Bill Text
627422Amended CodeSee Bill Text
627428Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6277152Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6277153Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/122
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/122/BillText/Filed/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/122/BillText/c1/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/122/BillText/c2/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/122/BillText/c3/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/122/Amendment/923034/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/122/Amendment/355342/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/122/Amendment/724484/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/122/Amendment/469254/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/122/Amendment/711030/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/122/Amendment/545092/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/122/Amendment/487740/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/122/Amendment/672446/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/122/Amendment/306982/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/122/Amendment/932552/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/122/Amendment/336048/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/122/Amendment/892198/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/122/Amendment/128452/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/122/Amendment/238720/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/

Bill Comments

feedback