FL H7051 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-08 - Laid on Table, refer to SB 7044
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-08 - Laid on Table, refer to SB 7044
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions relating to FCS institution & state university requirements for information related to textbooks & instructional materials, registration process, & tuition & fee rates; revises provisions relating to certain postsecondary registration processes, acceptance & application of specified courses & credits, accrediting processes for certain postsecondary institutions; creates a specified cause of action; & provides requirements for FCS institution or state university, respectively, to raise, impose, or authorize certain fees.
Title
Postsecondary Education
Sponsors
House Education and Employment Committee | House Post-Secondary Education and Lifelong Learning Subcommittee | Rep. Amber Mariano [R] | Rep. Melony Bell [R] |
Rep. Stan McClain [R] | Rep. Rick Roth [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-28 - House - House Education & Employment Committee (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-08 | House | Laid on Table, refer to SB 7044 |
2022-03-03 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2022-03-03 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2022-03-01 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2022-03-01 | House | CS Filed |
2022-03-01 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2022-03-01 | House | Reported out of Education & Employment Committee |
2022-02-28 | House | Favorable with CS by Education & Employment Committee |
2022-02-27 | House | Added to Education & Employment Committee agenda |
2022-02-21 | House | Added to Education & Employment Committee agenda |
2022-02-07 | House | Now in Education & Employment Committee |
2022-02-07 | House | Referred to Education & Employment Committee |
2022-02-03 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2022-02-03 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S7044 (Similar To) 2022-04-19 - Chapter No. 2022-70
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1004 | 085 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1007 | 24 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1008 | 47 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1009 | 23 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1009 | 24 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |