FL S7044 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-19 - Chapter No. 2022-70
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-19 - Chapter No. 2022-70
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing the Board of Governors to adopt a regulation regarding post-tenure reviews for state university faculty; revising the maintenance requirements of, and information that must be included in, the statewide course numbering system; requiring the Board of Governors and State Board of Education to identify and determine accrediting agencies or associations best suited for public postsecondary institutions by a specified date; requiring Florida College System institutions and state universities, respectively, to post specified information relating to tuition and fee rates and proposed changes to such rates on their websites, etc.
Title
Postsecondary Education
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#846 (Y: 77 N: 40 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#2 (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#36 (Y: 23 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate Education (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#2 (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#36 (Y: 23 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate Education (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-19 | Chapter No. 2022-70 | |
2022-04-19 | Approved by Governor | |
2022-04-19 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Ordered enrolled |
2022-03-09 | House | Passed; YEAS 77, NAYS 40 |
2022-03-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-08 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2022-03-08 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2022-03-08 | House | Amendment 440891 not allowed for consideration |
2022-03-08 | House | Amendment 190993 not allowed for consideration |
2022-03-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-03-07 | House | 1st Reading (Engrossed 1) |
2022-03-07 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/8/2022) |
2022-03-07 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2022-03-07 | House | In Messages |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Passed as amended; YEAS 22 NAYS 15 |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Ordered engrossed |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (356900, 544572, 958072) 682 |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Retained on Special Order Calendar |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/03/22 |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 11 NAYS 9 |
2022-02-21 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/24/22, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Introduced |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Filed |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Submitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Education; YEAS 6 NAYS 3 |
2022-02-03 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Education, 02/08/22, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Submitted for consideration by Education |
Same As/Similar To
H7051 (Similar To) 2022-03-08 - Laid on Table, refer to SB 7044
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1001 | 706 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1004 | 085 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1007 | 24 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1008 | 47 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1009 | 23 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1009 | 24 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |