FL H7035 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-19 - Chapter No. 2015-5
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-19 - Chapter No. 2015-5
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises date on which presidential preference primary is held.
Title
Presidential Preference Primary
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#3 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#12 (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#12 (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-19 | Chapter No. 2015-5 | |
2015-03-19 | Approved by Governor | |
2015-03-18 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2015-03-18 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Immediately certified |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Substituted for SB 7036 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Withdrawn from Ethics and Elections; Rules |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Received |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Referred to Ethics and Elections; Rules |
2015-03-17 | Senate | In Messages |
2015-03-11 | House | Passed; YEAS 114 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-11 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-03-10 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2015-03-10 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-03-06 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/10/15 |
2015-03-04 | House | Referred to Calendar |
2015-03-03 | House | Introduced |
2015-03-03 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S7036 (Same As) 2015-03-18 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7035 (Ch. 2015-5)