FL H7033 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Chapter No. 2019-31
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Removes scheduled repeal of exemption relating to certain information held by OFR relating to family trust companies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

OGSR/Family Trust Companies

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#12 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#29 (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-15 Chapter No. 2019-31
2019-05-14 Approved by Governor
2019-05-13 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2019-04-23HouseOrdered enrolled
2019-04-23SenateImmediately certified
2019-04-17SenatePassed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0
2019-04-17SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-10SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-04-10SenateRead 2nd time
2019-04-10SenateSubstituted for SB 7056
2019-04-10SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2019-04-10SenateWithdrawn from Banking and Insurance; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
2019-04-04SenateReceived
2019-04-04SenateReferred to Banking and Insurance; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
2019-04-03SenateIn Messages
2019-03-27HousePassed; YEAS 112 NAYS 0
2019-03-27HouseRead 3rd time
2019-03-27HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-03-27HouseRead 2nd time
2019-03-21HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/27/19
2019-03-14HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-03-14HouseFavorable by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 22 NAYS 0
2019-03-12HouseOn Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 03/14/19, 8:30 am, Morris Hall
2019-03-07HouseNow in State Affairs Committee
2019-03-07HouseFavorable by Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
2019-03-05HouseOn Committee agenda-- Insurance and Banking Subcommittee, 03/07/19, 9:15 am, Sumner Hall
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-02-18HouseReferred to Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee
2019-02-15HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S7056 (Same As) 2019-04-10 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 7033

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
662148Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback