FL S7056 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-10 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 7033
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amending provisions relating to an exemption from public records requirements for certain information held by the Office of Financial Regulation relating to family trust companies, licensed family trust companies, and foreign licensed family trust companies; removing the scheduled repeal of the exemption, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

OGSR/Family Trust Companies/Office of Financial Regulation

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-10SenateLaid on Table, refer to HB 7033
2019-04-10SenateSubstituted HB 7033
2019-04-10SenateRead 2nd time
2019-04-08SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/10/19
2019-04-04SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2019-04-03SenateFavorable by- Rules; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
2019-03-29SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/03/19, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
2019-03-12SenateNow in Rules
2019-03-12SenateFavorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2019-03-07SenateOn Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 03/12/19, 1:30 pm, 301 Senate Building
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-02-28SenateReferred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
2019-02-19SenateFiled
2019-02-19SenateSubmitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2019-02-12SenateOn Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 02/19/19, 12:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
2019-02-12SenateSubmitted for consideration by Banking and Insurance

Same As/Similar To

H7033 (Same As) 2019-05-15 - Chapter No. 2019-31

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
662148Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback