FL H6093 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Removes provisions relating to tax on and tax credits for having paid rental or license fee for use of real property.
Title
Tax on the Rental or Lease of Real Property
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Died in Ways & Means Committee |
2022-03-12 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-12-16 | House | Now in Ways & Means Committee |
2021-12-16 | House | Referred to Commerce Committee |
2021-12-16 | House | Referred to Ways & Means Committee |
2021-12-03 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1558 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1002 | 395 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 031 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 0598 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 0602 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 08 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 099 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 1258 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
338 | 234 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
341 | 840 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/6093 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/6093/BillText/Filed/PDF |