FL H6045 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Removes provision requiring a specified number of units to be provided for affordable housing for eligibility for ad valorem tax reduction.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Low-income Affordable Housing Tax Incentives

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03HouseDied in Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
2019-05-03HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-02-28HouseReferred to Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; Ways and Means Committee; State Affairs Committee
2019-02-15HouseFiled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1961978Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback