FL H6017 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 3 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Ordered enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Removes acreage limitations that apply to small-scale comprehensive plan amendments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Small-scale Comprehensive Plan Amendments

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#10 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#106 (Y: 108 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03HouseOrdered enrolled
2019-05-03SenatePassed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
2019-05-03SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-02SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-05-02SenateRead 2nd time
2019-05-02SenateSubstituted for SB 1494
2019-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2019-05-02SenateWithdrawn from Community Affairs; Infrastructure and Security; Rules
2019-04-22SenateReceived
2019-04-18SenateReferred to Community Affairs; Infrastructure and Security; Rules
2019-04-18SenateIn Messages
2019-04-11HousePassed; YEAS 108 NAYS 5
2019-04-11HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-10HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-04-10HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-04HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/10/19
2019-03-28HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-03-28HouseFavorable by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 18 NAYS 1
2019-03-26HouseOn Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 03/28/19, 10:30 am, Morris Hall
2019-03-05HouseNow in State Affairs Committee
2019-03-05HouseFavorable by Commerce Committee; YEAS 21 NAYS 0
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-03-01HouseOn Committee agenda-- Commerce Committee, 03/05/19, 4:30 pm, Webster Hall
2019-02-13HouseNow in Commerce Committee
2019-02-13HouseFavorable by Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0
2019-02-06HouseOn Committee agenda-- Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee, 02/13/19, 8:30 am, 12 HOB
2019-01-30HouseReferred to Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; Commerce Committee; State Affairs Committee
2019-01-23HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1494 (Same As) 2019-05-02 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 6017

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1633187Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback