FL H6017 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals provisions relating to security requirements for tobacco settlement agreement signatories, successors, parents, & affiliates.
Title
Tobacco Settlement Agreement
Sponsors
Rep. Cord Byrd [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | House | Died in Appropriations Committee |
2018-03-10 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-01-10 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2018-01-10 | House | Favorable by Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced |
2018-01-08 | House | On Committee agenda-- Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee, 01/10/18, 8:30 am, Sumner Hall |
2017-10-03 | House | Referred to Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; Judiciary Committee |
2017-09-25 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S124 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Regulated Industries
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/6017 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/6017/BillText/Filed/PDF |