FL H4011 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-14 - See HB 5001 (line item 1665A)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-14 - See HB 5001 (line item 1665A)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Old Town of Santa Rosa Smart Stormwater Quality Improvement and Flood Reduction.
Title
Old Town of Santa Rosa Smart Stormwater Quality Improvement and Flood Reduction
Sponsors
Rep. Brad Drake [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-01-13 - House - House Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | See HB 5001 (line item 1665A) |
2022-03-12 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-13 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2022-01-13 | House | Reported out of Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-01-13 | House | Favorable by Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2022-01-11 | House | Added to Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee Consent Agenda |
2021-11-30 | House | Now in Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-11-30 | House | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2021-11-30 | House | Referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-11-23 | House | Filed |