FL H4011 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-02 - Vetoed by Governor; See SB 2500 (line item 1915A)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on June 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-02 - Vetoed by Governor; See SB 2500 (line item 1915A)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Jackson County - Mashburn Road Pavement Completion Design.
Title
Jackson County - Mashburn Road Pavement Completion Design
Sponsors
Rep. Brad Drake [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-02 | Vetoed by Governor; See SB 2500 (line item 1915A) | |
2021-04-30 | House | See SB 2500 (line item 1915A) |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-02-23 | House | Now in Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-02-23 | House | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2021-02-23 | House | Referred to Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-02-17 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/4011 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/4011/BillText/Filed/PDF |