FL H1547 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-11 - Chapter No. 2010-268

Summary

Authorizes board of district trustees to increase cap on special assessments against lots in Lake Asbury Municipal Service Benefit District, subject to voter approval at referendum.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Lake Asbury Municipal Service District/Clay County

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-06-11 Chapter No. 2010-268
2010-05-07 Approved by Governor
2010-04-30 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor -HJ 01700
2010-04-28 Ordered enrolled -HJ 01287
2010-04-28 Withdrawn from Rules -SJ 00943; Placed on Local Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00949; Read 3rd time -SJ 00949; CS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 -SJ 00949
2010-04-26 Received -SJ 00871; Referred to Rules -SJ 00871
2010-04-22 In Messages
2010-04-22 Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -HJ 00910; Read 3rd time -HJ 00910; CS passed; YEAS 107 NAYS 0 -HJ 00910
2010-04-07 Favorable by- Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 -HJ 00647; Placed on Calendar -HJ 00647
2010-04-05 On Council agenda-- Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council, 04/07/10, 8:00 am, 404-H
2010-03-26 Now in Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council -HJ 00417
2010-03-25 Favorable by Finance & Tax Council; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 -HJ 00417
2010-03-23 On Council agenda-- Finance & Tax Council, 03/25/10, 1:00 pm, 404-H
2010-03-17 Now in Finance & Tax Council -HJ 00340
2010-03-16 CS read 1st time on 03/16/10 -HJ 00300; Pending review of CS under Rule 7.20
2010-03-15 CS by Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA); YEAS 12 NAYS 0 -HJ 00303
2010-03-11 On Committee agenda-- Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA), 03/15/10, 12:00 pm, Webster Hall
2010-03-10 Referred to Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA); Finance & Tax Council; Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council -HJ 00258
2010-03-02 Introduced -HJ 00141
2010-03-01 Filed

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback