FL H1515 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-27 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/CS/SB 1946, 1st Eng.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Grandfathers certain areas as anchoring limitation areas; authorizes local governments to establish anchoring limitation areas; revises provisions prohibiting & authorizing anchoring of vessels in anchoring limitation areas; provides for vessel owners & operators to present certain proof that vessel has not exceeded certain anchoring limitations; revises provisions authorizing removal & impoundment of certain vessels from anchoring limitation areas; declaring that certain vessels are public nuisance; directs FWCC to adopt specified rules.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Anchoring Limitation Areas

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-06 - House - House State Affairs Committee (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-27HouseLaid on Table, refer to CS/CS/CS/SB 1946, 1st Eng.
2021-04-20HouseAdded to Second Reading Calendar
2021-04-20HouseTemporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading
2021-04-15HouseBill added to Special Order Calendar (4/20/2021)
2021-04-15HouseAmendment 010007 withdrawn
2021-04-15HouseAmendment 010007 filed
2021-04-08HouseAdded to Second Reading Calendar
2021-04-08HouseBill referred to House Calendar
2021-04-07House1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
2021-04-06HouseCS Filed
2021-04-06HouseLaid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
2021-04-06HouseReported out of State Affairs Committee
2021-04-06HouseFavorable with CS by State Affairs Committee
2021-04-02HouseAdded to State Affairs Committee agenda
2021-03-29HouseNow in State Affairs Committee
2021-03-29HouseReferred to State Affairs Committee
2021-03-29HouseOriginal reference removed: Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
2021-03-25House1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
2021-03-25HouseCS Filed
2021-03-25HouseLaid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
2021-03-25HouseReported out of Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee
2021-03-23HouseFavorable with CS by Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee
2021-03-19HouseAdded to Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee agenda
2021-03-05HouseNow in Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee
2021-03-05HouseReferred to State Affairs Committee
2021-03-05HouseReferred to Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
2021-03-05HouseReferred to Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee
2021-03-02House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2021-03-01HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1946 (Same As) 2021-04-28 - Ordered enrolled
H639 (Similar To) 2021-04-27 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/SB 1086, 1st Eng.
S1086 (Similar To) 2021-06-16 - Signed by Officers and presented to Governor

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3274108Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32773Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1515
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1515/BillText/Filed/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1515/BillText/c1/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1515/BillText/c2/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1515/Amendment/133229/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1515/Amendment/010007/PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1515/Analyses/h1515.EAF.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1515/Analyses/h1515a.EAF.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1515/Analyses/h1515b.SAC.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1515/Analyses/h1515c.SAC.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1515/Analyses/h1515z.EAF.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.myfloridahouse.gov/Sections/Committees/billvote.aspx?VoteId=59122&IsPCB=0&BillId=72752
Roll Callhttps://www.myfloridahouse.gov/Sections/Committees/billvote.aspx?VoteId=59893&IsPCB=0&BillId=72752

Bill Comments 750

feedback