FL S1086 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Enrolled on April 29 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Revising conditions under which a person's driving privilege is suspended and under which the person commits a misdemeanor relating to tests for alcohol, chemical substances, or controlled substances; requiring the clerk of the court to notify the Department of Highway Safety and Motor Vehicles of certain final dispositions by electronic transmission; providing circumstances under which a person may operate a human-powered vessel within the boundaries of the marked channel of the Florida Intracoastal Waterway; designating Monroe County as an anchoring limitation area subject to certain requirements; authorizing a county or municipality to establish a boating-restricted area within and around a public mooring field and within certain portions of the Florida Intracoastal Waterway, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Operation and Safety of Motor Vehicles and Vessels

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-29 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#414 (Y: 114 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#382 (Y: 114 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#31 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Senate - Senate Appropriations (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Senate - Senate Environment and Natural Resources (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-16 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2021-04-29SenateOrdered enrolled
2021-04-29HouseMessage sent to senate
2021-04-29HouseCS passed; YEAS 114, NAYS 1
2021-04-29HouseAmendment 253597 Recede
2021-04-29HouseAmendment 608587 Recede
2021-04-29HouseAdded to Senate Message List
2021-04-28HouseIn Messages
2021-04-28SenateRequested House to recede
2021-04-28SenateRefused to concur in 2 amendment(s) (253597, 608587)
2021-04-28SenateIn returning messages
2021-04-28HouseMessage sent to senate
2021-04-28HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 114, NAYS 2
2021-04-28HouseRead 3rd time
2021-04-27HouseAdded to Third Reading Calendar
2021-04-27HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2021-04-27HouseAmendment 253597 adopted
2021-04-27HouseAmendment 608587 adopted
2021-04-27HouseRead 2nd time
2021-04-26House1st Reading (Engrossed 1)
2021-04-26HouseBill added to Special Order Calendar (4/27/2021)
2021-04-26HouseBill referred to House Calendar
2021-04-26HouseAmendment 253597 filed
2021-04-26HouseAmendment 608587 filed
2021-04-21HouseIn Messages
2021-04-21SenateCS passed as amended; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
2021-04-21SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-21SenateAmendment(s) adopted (189384, 765050)
2021-04-21SenateRead 2nd time
2021-04-20SenateCS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time
2021-04-19SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/21/21
2021-04-19SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2021-04-18SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2021-04-15SenateCS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 20 NAYS 0
2021-04-14SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/19/21, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2021-04-12SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/15/21, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2021-04-12SenateNow in Appropriations
2021-04-08SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
2021-04-05SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government, 04/08/21, 11:30 am, 110 Senate Building
2021-03-17SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government
2021-03-16SenateCS by Environment and Natural Resources read 1st time
2021-03-16SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2021-03-15SenateCS by Environment and Natural Resources; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2021-03-10SenateOn Committee agenda-- Environment and Natural Resources, 03/15/21, 3:30 pm, 37 Senate Building
2021-03-02SenateIntroduced
2021-02-10SenateReferred to Environment and Natural Resources; Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Appropriations
2021-02-05SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H639 (Similar To) 2021-04-27 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/SB 1086, 1st Eng.
H1515 (Similar To) 2021-04-27 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/CS/SB 1946, 1st Eng.
S1946 (Similar To) 2021-04-28 - Ordered enrolled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3161932Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3161939Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32702Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32704Amended CodeSee Bill Text
327352Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32735215Amended CodeSee Bill Text
327359Amended CodeSee Bill Text
327371Amended CodeSee Bill Text
327391Amended CodeSee Bill Text
327395Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3274107Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3274108Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3274109Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32745Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32746Amended CodeSee Bill Text
327462Amended CodeSee Bill Text
327463Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32750Amended CodeSee Bill Text
327521Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32753Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32754Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32760Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32773Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32809Amended CodeSee Bill Text
37615Amended CodeSee Bill Text
705103Amended CodeSee Bill Text
82311Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1086
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1086/BillText/Filed/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1086/BillText/c1/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1086/BillText/c2/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1086/BillText/e1/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1086/BillText/er/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1086/Amendment/878734/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1086/Amendment/789166/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1086/Amendment/699748/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1086/Amendment/685556/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1086/Amendment/379252/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1086/Amendment/949606/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1086/Amendment/478396/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1086/Amendment/189384/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1086/Amendment/236616/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1086/Amendment/239758/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1086/Amendment/297888/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1086/Amendment/765050/HTML
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1086/Analyses/2021s01086.pre.en.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1086/Analyses/2021s01086.en.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1086/Analyses/2021s01086.pre.aeg.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1086/Analyses/2021s01086.aeg.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1086/Analyses/2021s01086.pre.ap.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1086/Analyses/2021s01086-pcs518944.ap.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1086/Analyses/2021s01086.ap.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1086/Analyses/2021s01086.hms.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1086/Vote/SenateVote_s01086c2031.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1086/Vote/HouseVote_s01086e1382.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1086/Vote/HouseVote_s01086e1414.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1086/Vote/2021-03-15%200330PM~S01086%20Vote%20Record.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1086/Vote/2021-04-08%201130AM~S01086%20Vote%20Record.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1086/Vote/2021-04-15%200900AM~S01086%20Vote%20Record.PDF

Bill Comments 750

feedback