FL H0639 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-27 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/SB 1086, 1st Eng.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Revises & creates provisions relating to tests for alcohol, chemical substances, or controlled substances; vessel safety, operation, & navigation; temporary protection zones on certain water bodies for spaceflight launches & asset recovery; boating safety education courses & certification exams; boating limitation areas; public nuisance, abandoned, or lost vessels; public mooring; no-discharge zones; marine sanitation; & civil & criminal penalties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Operation and Safety of Motor Vehicles and Vessels

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-19 - House - House State Affairs Committee (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - House Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - House Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - House Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-27HouseLaid on Table, refer to CS/CS/SB 1086, 1st Eng.
2021-04-22HouseAdded to Second Reading Calendar
2021-04-22HouseBill referred to House Calendar
2021-04-20House1st Reading (Committee Substitute 3)
2021-04-20HouseCS Filed
2021-04-20HouseLaid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
2021-04-20HouseReported out of State Affairs Committee
2021-04-19HouseFavorable with CS by State Affairs Committee
2021-04-18HouseAdded to State Affairs Committee agenda
2021-04-01HouseNow in State Affairs Committee
2021-04-01HouseReported out of Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
2021-04-01HouseFavorable by Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
2021-03-30HouseAdded to Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee agenda
2021-03-24HouseNow in Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
2021-03-24HouseReferred to State Affairs Committee
2021-03-24HouseReferred to Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
2021-03-23House1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
2021-03-23HouseCS Filed
2021-03-23HouseLaid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
2021-03-23HouseReported out of Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
2021-03-22HouseFavorable with CS by Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
2021-03-18HouseAdded to Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee agenda
2021-03-09HouseNow in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
2021-03-09HouseReferred to State Affairs Committee
2021-03-09HouseReferred to Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
2021-03-09HouseReferred to Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
2021-03-08House1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
2021-03-05HouseCS Filed
2021-03-05HouseLaid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
2021-03-05HouseReported out of Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee
2021-03-03HouseFavorable with CS by Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee
2021-03-02House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2021-03-01HouseAdded to Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee agenda
2021-02-18HouseNow in Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee
2021-02-18HouseReferred to State Affairs Committee
2021-02-18HouseReferred to Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
2021-02-18HouseReferred to Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
2021-02-18HouseReferred to Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee
2021-02-01HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1086 (Similar To) 2021-06-16 - Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
H1515 (Similar To) 2021-04-27 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/CS/SB 1946, 1st Eng.
S1946 (Similar To) 2021-04-28 - Ordered enrolled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3161932Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3161939Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32702Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32704Amended CodeSee Bill Text
327352Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32735215Amended CodeSee Bill Text
327359Amended CodeSee Bill Text
327371Amended CodeSee Bill Text
327391Amended CodeSee Bill Text
327395Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3274107Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3274109Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32745Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32746Amended CodeSee Bill Text
327462Amended CodeSee Bill Text
327463Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32750Amended CodeSee Bill Text
327521Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32753Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32754Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32760Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32773Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32809Amended CodeSee Bill Text
37615Amended CodeSee Bill Text
705103Amended CodeSee Bill Text
82311Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/639
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/639/BillText/Filed/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/639/BillText/c1/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/639/BillText/c2/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/639/BillText/c3/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/639/Amendment/405741/PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/639/Analyses/h0639.EAF.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/639/Analyses/h0639a.EAF.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/639/Analyses/h0639b.CRM.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/639/Analyses/h0639c.CRM.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/639/Analyses/h0639d.ANR.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/639/Analyses/h0639e.ANR.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/639/Analyses/h0639f.SAC.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/639/Analyses/h0639g.SAC.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/639/Analyses/h0639z.EAF.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.myfloridahouse.gov/Sections/Committees/billvote.aspx?VoteId=57232&IsPCB=0&BillId=70988
Roll Callhttps://www.myfloridahouse.gov/Sections/Committees/billvote.aspx?VoteId=59305&IsPCB=0&BillId=70988
Roll Callhttps://www.myfloridahouse.gov/Sections/Committees/billvote.aspx?VoteId=59696&IsPCB=0&BillId=70988
Roll Callhttps://www.myfloridahouse.gov/Sections/Committees/billvote.aspx?VoteId=60518&IsPCB=0&BillId=70988

Bill Comments 750

feedback