FL S1946 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on April 28 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-04-28 - Ordered enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Providing that certain areas are grandfathered-in anchoring limitation areas; authorizing certain counties to establish anchoring limitation areas that meet certain requirements; specifying size requirements for the anchoring limitation areas; prohibiting vessels from anchoring in such areas for longer than a specified time; requiring counties to provide notice to the Fish and Wildlife Conservation Commission within a specified timeframe before introducing an ordinance to establish an anchoring limitation area; prohibiting Monroe County from establishing an anchoring limitation area until the county meets certain requirements, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Anchoring Limitation Areas

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-28 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#381 (Y: 116 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#33 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - Senate - Senate Rules (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate Community Affairs (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate Environment and Natural Resources (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-28SenateOrdered enrolled
2021-04-28HouseMessage sent to senate
2021-04-28HouseCS passed; YEAS 116, NAYS 1
2021-04-28HouseRead 3rd time
2021-04-27HouseAdded to Third Reading Calendar
2021-04-27HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2021-04-27HouseRead 2nd time
2021-04-26House1st Reading (Engrossed 1)
2021-04-26HouseBill added to Special Order Calendar (4/27/2021)
2021-04-26HouseBill referred to House Calendar
2021-04-21HouseIn Messages
2021-04-21SenateCS passed as amended; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
2021-04-21SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-21SenateAmendment(s) adopted (555226)
2021-04-21SenateRead 2nd time
2021-04-20SenateCS/CS/CS by Rules read 1st time
2021-04-19SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/21/21
2021-04-19SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2021-04-16SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2021-04-16SenateCS/CS/CS by- Rules; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
2021-04-15SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/20/21, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building
2021-04-13SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/16/21, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2021-04-02SenateNow in Rules
2021-04-01SenateCS/CS by Community Affairs read 1st time
2021-03-31SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2021-03-30SenateCS/CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
2021-03-25SenateOn Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 03/30/21, 3:30 pm, 37 Senate Building
2021-03-24SenateNow in Community Affairs
2021-03-23SenateCS by Environment and Natural Resources read 1st time
2021-03-23SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2021-03-22SenateCS by Environment and Natural Resources; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
2021-03-17SenateOn Committee agenda-- Environment and Natural Resources, 03/22/21, 3:30 pm, 37 Senate Building
2021-03-10SenateIntroduced
2021-03-04SenateReferred to Environment and Natural Resources; Community Affairs; Rules
2021-03-01SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1515 (Same As) 2021-04-27 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/CS/SB 1946, 1st Eng.
H639 (Similar To) 2021-04-27 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/SB 1086, 1st Eng.
S1086 (Similar To) 2021-04-29 - Ordered enrolled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3274108Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32773Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1946
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1946/BillText/Filed/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1946/BillText/c1/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1946/BillText/c2/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1946/BillText/c3/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1946/BillText/e1/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1946/BillText/er/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1946/Amendment/513168/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1946/Amendment/921354/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1946/Amendment/856618/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1946/Amendment/555226/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1946/Amendment/331560/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1946/Amendment/439588/HTML
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1946/Analyses/2021s01946.pre.en.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1946/Analyses/2021s01946.en.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1946/Analyses/2021s01946.pre.ca.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1946/Analyses/2021s01946.ca.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1946/Analyses/2021s01946.pre.rc.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1946/Analyses/2021s01946.rc.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1946/Vote/SenateVote_s01946c3033.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1946/Vote/HouseVote_s01946e1381.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1946/Vote/2021-03-22%200330PM~S01946%20Vote%20Record.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1946/Vote/2021-03-30%200330PM~S01946%20Vote%20Record.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1946/Vote/2021-04-16%200900AM~S01946%20Vote%20Record.PDF

Bill Comments 750

feedback