FL H1505 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-1)
Status: Passed on June 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-07 - Chapter No. 2010-227
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-1)
Status: Passed on June 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-07 - Chapter No. 2010-227
Summary
Revises provisions relating to John M. McKay Scholarships for Students with Disabilities Program; authorizes Commissioner of Education to deny, suspend, or revoke private school's participation in scholarship program if owner or operator of such school has operated educational institution in this state or another in manner contrary to health, safety, or welfare of public, etc.
Title
Education Programs for Children with Disabilities [SPSC]
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-07 | Chapter No. 2010-227 | |
2010-06-04 | Approved by Governor | |
2010-05-21 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2010-04-30 | Concurred -HJ 01322; CS passed as amended; YEAS 118 NAYS 0 -HJ 01324; Ordered engrossed, then enrolled -HJ 01324 | |
2010-04-29 | In returning messages | |
2010-04-29 | Read 3rd time -SJ 01082; CS passed as amended; YEAS 37 NAYS 0 -SJ 01082 | |
2010-04-28 | Withdrawn from Education Pre-K - 12; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means -SJ 00980; Substituted for CS/CS/SB 2746 -SJ 00980; Read 2nd time -SJ 00980; Amendment(s) adopted (662512, 312442) -SJ 00982 | |
2010-04-27 | Received -SJ 00921; Referred to Education Pre-K - 12; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means -SJ 00921 | |
2010-04-21 | In Messages | |
2010-04-21 | Read 3rd time -HJ 00800; CS passed; YEAS 115 NAYS 0 -HJ 00800 | |
2010-04-20 | Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -HJ 00777 | |
2010-04-07 | Placed on Calendar -HJ 00629 | |
2010-04-06 | Favorable by- Education Policy Council; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 -HJ 00629 | |
2010-04-05 | On Council agenda-- Education Policy Council, 04/07/10, 9:00 am, Morris Hall | |
2010-03-26 | Favorable by PreK-12 Appropriations (CEED); YEAS 8 NAYS 0 -HJ 00410; Now in Education Policy Council -HJ 00410 | |
2010-03-24 | On Committee agenda-- PreK-12 Appropriations (CEED), 03/26/10, 8:30 am, 404-H | |
2010-03-19 | Now in PreK-12 Appropriations (CEED) -HJ 00351 | |
2010-03-18 | CS read 1st time on 03/18/10 -HJ 00339; Pending review of CS under Rule 7.20 | |
2010-03-17 | CS by PreK-12 Policy (EPC); YEAS 12 NAYS 0 -HJ 00343 | |
2010-03-15 | On Committee agenda-- PreK-12 Policy (EPC), 03/17/10, 9:30 am, Morris Hall | |
2010-03-10 | Referred to PreK-12 Policy (EPC); PreK-12 Appropriations (CEED); Education Policy Council -HJ 00257 | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced -HJ 00136 | |
2010-03-01 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S2746 (Similar To) 2010-04-28 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00958; Was taken up -SJ 00979; Amendment(s) adopted (641996, 454558) -SJ 00980; Substituted CS/HB 1505 -SJ 00980; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1505 (Ch. 2010-227) -SJ 00980
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1002 | 20 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 39 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 51 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 53 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 66 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 71 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 73 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 75 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/index.cfm?Mode=Bills&SubMenu=1&Tab=session&BI_Mode=ViewBillInfo&BillNum=1505&Chamber=House&Year=2010 |