FL H1483 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-05 - Ordered enrolled -HJ 1098
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-05 - Ordered enrolled -HJ 1098
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises location of law library; removes outdated & unnecessary sections relating to assessment of certain fees & court costs.
Title
Alachua County
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#31 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#993 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#993 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-05 | Ordered enrolled -HJ 1098 | |
2012-03-05 | Passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 -SJ 803 | |
2012-03-05 | Withdrawn from Rules -SJ 799 | |
2012-03-01 | Referred to Rules -SJ 762 | |
2012-03-01 | Received -SJ 762 | |
2012-02-29 | In Messages | |
2012-02-29 | Passed; YEAS 116 NAYS 0 -HJ 953 | |
2012-02-29 | Read 3rd time -HJ 953 | |
2012-02-28 | Placed on 3rd reading | |
2012-02-28 | Read 2nd time -HJ 898 | |
2012-02-24 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/28/12 | |
2012-02-16 | Placed on Calendar -HJ 683 | |
2012-02-16 | Favorable by- Economic Affairs Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 -HJ 683 | |
2012-02-14 | On Committee agenda-- Economic Affairs Committee, 02/16/12, 11:30 am, Reed Hall | |
2012-02-07 | Now in Economic Affairs Committee -HJ 549 | |
2012-02-07 | Favorable by Community and Military Affairs Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 -HJ 549 | |
2012-02-03 | On Committee agenda-- Community and Military Affairs Subcommittee, 02/07/12, 8:00 am, Webster Hall | |
2012-01-12 | Introduced -HJ 210 | |
2012-01-12 | Filed |