FL H1435 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits publication or broadcast of recordings of calls to 911 emergency services by minors & recordings of such calls by adults unless voices of all persons recorded are obscured or masked so as to render persons recorded unidentifiable; provides construction.
Title
911 Calls
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-03-29 | On Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 03/31/11, 12:00 pm, Morris Hall --Temporarily deferred | |
2011-03-18 | Referred to State Affairs Committee; Judiciary Committee -HJ 258 | |
2011-03-09 | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/1435 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/1435/BillText/Filed/HTML |