FL H1427 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that person driving vehicle that passes school bus on side children enter/exit while bus displays stop signal commits reckless driving; provides penalties.
Title
School Bus Safety
Sponsors
Rep. John Cortes [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | House | Died in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2017-05-05 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-03-22 | House | Now in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2017-03-21 | House | Favorable by Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-17 | House | On Committee agenda-- Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee, 03/21/17, 8:00 am, Reed Hall |
2017-03-10 | House | Referred to Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Government Accountability Committee |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced |
2017-03-07 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1648 (Same As) 2017-05-05 - Died in Criminal Justice
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
316 | 172 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
318 | 17 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
318 | 18 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
318 | 19 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
318 | 21 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
395 | 4036 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/1427 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/1427/BillText/Filed/PDF |