FL H1397 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 25-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Restricts circumstances in which abortion may be performed in 3rd trimester or after viability; requires clinic to disclose in advertisement that it cannot perform abortions in 3rd trimester or after viability; requires physician who offers to or performs terminations to complete ethics continuing education; prohibits terminations except in certain licensed locations; prohibits performing certain functions concerning abortion clinic without license, etc.
Title
Abortions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-27 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#308 (Y: 79 N: 36 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#290 (Y: 35 N: 73 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-04-26 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#289 (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#290 (Y: 35 N: 73 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-04-26 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#289 (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-04-27 | In Messages | |
2011-04-27 | Read 3rd time -HJ 811 | |
2011-04-26 | Read 2nd time -HJ 785 | |
2011-04-22 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/26/11 | |
2011-04-21 | Placed on Calendar -HJ 760 | |
2011-04-20 | CS/CS by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 11 NAYS 5 -HJ 762 | |
2011-04-18 | On Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 04/20/11, 10:00 am, Morris Hall | |
2011-03-28 | Now in Health and Human Services Committee -HJ 339 | |
2011-03-25 | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) | |
2011-03-22 | CS by Health and Human Services Quality Subcommittee; YEAS 9 NAYS 3 -HJ 340 | |
2011-03-18 | On Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Quality Subcommittee, 03/22/11, 8:30 am, 306 HOB | |
2011-03-14 | Referred to Health and Human Services Quality Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee -HJ 222 | |
2011-03-08 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
390 | 0111 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
390 | 0112 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
390 | 012 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
456 | 013 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
797 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
797 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |