FL H1393 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises & provides bylaw provisions for condominium & cooperative associations relating to waiving or reducing amount of reserve funds, reserve fund study requirements, annual structural inspections of buildings, structural & electrical recertification inspections, recertification reports, completion reports of remedial action, penalties for failing to submit certain reports, & mandatory evacuations; revises documents that must be delivered to prospective buyer or lessee of residential unit; revises contract clauses for resale of residential unit; requires construction & renovation of residential condominium & cooperative buildings to comply with Florida Building Code; provides requirements for waterproofing measures of certain elements of community associations in Florida Building Code.
Title
Condominium and Cooperative Associations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Died in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee |
2022-03-12 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-14 | House | Now in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee |
2022-01-14 | House | Referred to Commerce Committee |
2022-01-14 | House | Referred to Pandemics & Public Emergencies Committee |
2022-01-14 | House | Referred to Regulatory Reform Subcommittee |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2022-01-08 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1391 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
S1780 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Regulated Industries
S1942 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Died in Regulated Industries
S7042 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
H7069 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in returning Messages
S1702 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 7069
S1780 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Regulated Industries
S1942 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Died in Regulated Industries
S7042 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
H7069 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in returning Messages
S1702 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 7069
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
553 | 73 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
718 | 112 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
718 | 503 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
718 | 618 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
718 | 706 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
719 | 103 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
719 | 106 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
719 | 503 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/1393 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/1393/BillText/Filed/PDF |