FL H1391 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires certain buildings to be inspected upon building reaching 30 years of age & every 5 years thereafter; requires inspection be completed by specified architect or engineer; requires boards of such community associations to convene within specified time after receipt of inspection report for specified purpose; requires associations to provide copy of inspection report to local authority having jurisdiction & make report available to its members within specified time; requires copy of inspection report be maintained in associations' official records; requires developer to provide specified inspection report upon transition of association control under certain circumstances.
Title
Community Associations' Building Inspections
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Died in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee |
2022-03-12 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-14 | House | Now in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee |
2022-01-14 | House | Referred to Commerce Committee |
2022-01-14 | House | Referred to Pandemics & Public Emergencies Committee |
2022-01-14 | House | Referred to Regulatory Reform Subcommittee |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2022-01-08 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1780 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Died in Regulated Industries
S1702 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 7069
H1393 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
S1942 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Regulated Industries
S7042 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
S1702 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 7069
H1393 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
S1942 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Regulated Industries
S7042 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
718 | 111 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
718 | 112 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
718 | 301 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
719 | 104 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
719 | 106 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
720 | 303 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
720 | 307 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/1391 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/1391/BillText/Filed/PDF |