FL S1942 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Regulated Industries
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Regulated Industries
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring that the Florida Building Code require enhanced waterproofing measures for certain elements of community associations; prohibiting a developer or condominium or cooperative association, respectively, from waiving or reducing the amount of its reserve funds; requiring elected or appointed board members to complete an educational curriculum within a specified time and submit a certificate of completion to the secretary of the association; requiring the board to hire a licensed structural engineer to conduct an annual inspection of association property; revising the documents that must be delivered to a prospective buyer or lessee of a residential unit, etc.
Title
Condominium and Cooperative Associations
Sponsors
Sen. Jason Pizzo [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | Senate | Died in Regulated Industries |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Introduced |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Regulated Industries; Community Affairs; Rules |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1393 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Died in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
H1391 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
S1780 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Regulated Industries
S7042 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
H7069 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in returning Messages
S1702 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 7069
H1391 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
S1780 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Regulated Industries
S7042 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
H7069 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in returning Messages
S1702 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 7069
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
553 | 73 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
718 | 112 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
718 | 503 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
718 | 618 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
718 | 706 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
719 | 103 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
719 | 106 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
719 | 503 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/1942 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/1942/BillText/Filed/HTML |