FL H1357 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died on Second Reading Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died on Second Reading Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Memorial to United States DOS urging inclusion of Taiwan in Indo-Pacific Economic Framework (IPEF), regional multilateral economic agreement designed to promote trade policy collaboration among IPEF nations as well as counter China's economic influence in Asia-Pacific region.
Title
Inclusion of Taiwan in Indo-Pacific Economic Framework
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-11 - House - House State Affairs Committee (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - House - House Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - House - House Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-05 | House | Died on Second Reading Calendar |
2023-04-11 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2023-04-11 | House | Bill released to House Calendar |
2023-04-11 | House | Reported out of State Affairs Committee |
2023-04-11 | House | Favorable by State Affairs Committee |
2023-04-07 | House | Added to State Affairs Committee agenda |
2023-03-29 | House | Now in State Affairs Committee |
2023-03-29 | House | Reported out of Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee |
2023-03-29 | House | Favorable by Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee |
2023-03-27 | House | Added to Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee agenda |
2023-03-09 | House | Now in Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee |
2023-03-09 | House | Referred to State Affairs Committee |
2023-03-09 | House | Referred to Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee |
2023-03-07 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2023-03-02 | House | Filed |