FL H1351 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the program to incorporate specified components to be considered an early childhood court; authorizing the office to hire a statewide community coordinator; requiring the Florida Institute for Child Welfare to conduct an evaluation of the program's impact in consultation with the Department of Children and Families, the office, and the center, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Early Childhood Court Programs

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-05 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#769 (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Messages
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-03-05SenateIn Messages
2018-03-05HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 112 NAYS 0 860
2018-03-05HouseRead 3rd time
2018-03-02HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-03-02HouseAmendment(s) adopted (821287) 802
2018-03-02HouseRead 2nd time
2018-02-27HouseCS/CS by Appropriations Committee read 1st time
2018-02-27HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/02/18
2018-02-27HouseReferred to- Calendar
2018-02-27HouseOriginal reference(s) removed: Judiciary Committee
2018-02-27HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2018-02-27HouseCS/CS by Appropriations Committee; YEAS 20 NAYS 0
2018-02-25HouseOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee, 02/27/18, 9:00 am, Webster Hall
2018-01-25HouseNow in Appropriations Committee
2018-01-24HouseCS by Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee read 1st time
2018-01-24HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2018-01-23HouseCS by Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0
2018-01-19HouseOn Committee agenda-- Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee, 01/23/18, 3:30 pm, Sumner Hall
2018-01-12HouseReferred to Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; Judiciary Committee
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2018-01-08HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1442 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3901304Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback