FL S1442 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum:
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring the program to incorporate specified components to be considered an early childhood court; authorizing the courts to create early childhood court programs; requiring the Office of the State Courts Administrator to contract with certain university based centers; requiring the office, in partnership with the center and within appropriated funds, to provide training to program court teams, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Early Childhood Court Programs

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Appropriations
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-02-21SenateNow in Appropriations
2018-02-21SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2018-02-16SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice, 02/21/18, 1:30 pm, 37 Senate Office Building
2018-02-01SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
2018-01-31SenateCS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs read 1st time
2018-01-30SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-01-29SenateCS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 4 NAYS 0
2018-01-24SenateOn Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 01/29/18, 4:00 pm, 401 Senate Office Building
2018-01-17SenateIntroduced
2018-01-12SenateReferred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations
2018-01-02SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1351 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Messages

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3901304Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback