FL H1337 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Designates specified waterways as anchoring limitation areas.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Anchoring Limitation Areas

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-30HouseDied in Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee
2021-03-05HouseNow in Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee
2021-03-05HouseReferred to State Affairs Committee
2021-03-05HouseReferred to Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee
2021-03-02House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2021-02-25HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1652 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Environment and Natural Resources

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3274108Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback