FL H1333 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 447 (Ch. 2019-75)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes Florida Building Commission to approve certain updates to Florida Building Code every 3 years; prohibits local government from carrying forward more than specified amount of certain unexpended funds; requires local government to use certain unexpended funds for specified purposes; provides certain notices are not an action.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Building Construction Procedures

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03HouseDied on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 447 (Ch. 2019-75)
2019-05-03HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-04-23HouseCS by Commerce Committee read 1st time
2019-04-23HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-04-22HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-04-18HouseCS by- Commerce Committee; YEAS 20 NAYS 0
2019-04-16HouseOn Committee agenda-- Commerce Committee, 04/18/19, 8:15 am, Webster Hall
2019-04-09HouseNow in Commerce Committee
2019-04-09HouseFavorable by Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2019-04-05HouseOn Committee agenda-- Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee, 04/09/19, 8:30 am, Morris Hall
2019-03-26HouseNow in Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
2019-03-26HouseFavorable by Business and Professions Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0
2019-03-22HouseOn Committee agenda-- Business and Professions Subcommittee, 03/26/19, 12:00 pm, Webster Hall
2019-03-08HouseReferred to Business and Professions Subcommittee; Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee; Commerce Committee
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-03-04HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1800 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 447 (Ch. 2019-75)
H27 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 827 (Ch. 2019-86)
H715 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in State Affairs Committee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 447 (Ch. 2019-75)
S1036 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 447 (Ch. 2019-75)
H447 (Similar To) 2019-06-10 - Chapter No. 2019-75

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
468609Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4688312Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4688313Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4891195Amended CodeSee Bill Text
55373Amended CodeSee Bill Text
55380Amended CodeSee Bill Text
558004Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback