FL S1036 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 447 (Ch. 2019-75)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 447 (Ch. 2019-75)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting a local government from carrying forward more than a specified amount of unexpended revenue; revising requirements for the expenditure of certain unexpended revenue; expanding the list of activities that are prohibited from being funded by fees adopted for enforcing the Florida Building Code, etc.
Title
Florida Building Code Enforcement
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 447 (Ch. 2019-75) |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-04-16 | Senate | CS by Community Affairs read 1st time |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Now in Innovation, Industry, and Technology |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2019-04-09 | Senate | CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 04/09/19, 10:00 am, 301 Senate Building |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Community Affairs; Innovation, Industry, and Technology; Rules |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H715 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in State Affairs Committee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 447 (Ch. 2019-75)
H1333 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 447 (Ch. 2019-75)
H447 (Similar To) 2019-06-10 - Chapter No. 2019-75
H1333 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 447 (Ch. 2019-75)
H447 (Similar To) 2019-06-10 - Chapter No. 2019-75