FL H1315 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires DOC to establish an independent incentivized prison program for nonviolent offenders; provides location requirements for program; specifies admission criteria & program requirements; provides reporting requirements.
Title
Independent Incentivized Prison Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-30 - House - House Criminal Justice Subcommittee (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | House | Died in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2024-01-31 | House | Now in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2024-01-31 | House | Reported out of Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2024-01-30 | House | Favorable by Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2024-01-26 | House | Added to Criminal Justice Subcommittee agenda |
2024-01-13 | House | Now in Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2024-01-13 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2024-01-13 | House | Referred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2024-01-13 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2024-01-09 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2024-01-05 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1048 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice