FL H1285 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Insurance and Banking Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Insurance and Banking Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Mandates certain coverage for mental & nervous disorders under specified health insurance policies or contracts & revises required benefits for such coverage.
Title
Insurance Coverage for Mental and Nervous Disorders
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | House | Died in Insurance and Banking Subcommittee |
2016-01-15 | House | Referred to Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2016-01-12 | House | Introduced |
2016-01-08 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1582 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Banking and Insurance
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/1285 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/1285/BillText/Filed/PDF |