FL H1273 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Redefines "intellectual disability" as it relates to defendants who have been found incompetent to proceed; requires APD to assist certain defendants found incompetent to proceed with application to long-term care managed care program.
Title
Defendants with a Traumatic Brain Injury
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Died in Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee |
2022-03-12 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-12 | House | Now in Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to Health & Human Services Committee |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2022-01-06 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S218 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Died in Judiciary
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
916 | 106 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
916 | 303 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/1273 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/1273/BillText/Filed/PDF |