FL S0218 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Redefining the term "intellectual disability" as it relates to defendants who have been found to be incompetent to proceed by adding the terms "significantly deficient in adaptive functioning" and "traumatic brain injury"; requiring the Agency for Persons with Disabilities to assist certain defendants found incompetent to proceed with application to the long-term care managed care program, etc.
Title
Defendants with a Traumatic Brain Injury
Sponsors
Sen. Gary Farmer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | Senate | Died in Judiciary |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-09-21 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Criminal Justice; Appropriations |
2021-09-14 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1273 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Died in Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
916 | 106 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
916 | 303 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/218 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/218/BillText/Filed/HTML |