FL H1259 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempts Division of Florida Condominiums, Timeshares, and Mobile Homes Trust Fund from provision authorizing Legislature, in General Appropriations Act, to transfer unappropriated cash balances from specified trust funds to Budget Stabilization Fund & General Revenue Fund; revises criminal penalties relating to acceptance of things or services of value or kickbacks; provides criminal penalties; revises criminal penalties relating to use of association debit cards; provides criminal penalties for fraudulent voting activities related to association elections.
Title
Division of Florida Condominiums, Timeshares, and Mobile Homes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | House | Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2019-05-03 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-08 | House | Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; Judiciary Committee |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-03-03 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S610 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
215 | 32 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
718 | 111 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
718 | 129 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1259 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1259/BillText/Filed/PDF |