FL H1257 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Business and Professions Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Business and Professions Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires DBPR & Board of Cosmetology, respectively, to prescribe by rule 1-hour course on domestic violence & sexual assault awareness as condition of license or registration renewal.
Title
Continuing Education For Barbers, Cosmetologists, and Specialists
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | House | Died in Business and Professions Subcommittee |
2019-05-03 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-08 | House | Referred to Business and Professions Subcommittee; Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee; Commerce Committee |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-03-03 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S388 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
476 | 154 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
477 | 019 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1257 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1257/BillText/Filed/PDF |