FL H1235 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for Internet website publication of legal notices; provides criteria for such publication; authorizes fiscally constrained county to use publicly accessible website to publish legally required advertisements & public notices only if certain requirements are met; requires governmental agency to provide specified notice to residents concerning alternative methods of receiving legal notices.
Title
Legal Notices
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-17 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#179 (Y: 68 N: 44 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | Died in Judiciary |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Received |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2019-04-23 | Senate | In Messages |
2019-04-17 | House | CS passed; YEAS 68 NAYS 44 |
2019-04-17 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-17 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-11 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/17/19 |
2019-04-05 | House | Referred to- Calendar |
2019-04-05 | House | Original reference(s) removed: State Affairs Committee |
2019-04-04 | House | CS/CS by Judiciary Committee read 1st time |
2019-04-04 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2019-04-03 | House | CS/CS by Judiciary Committee; YEAS 11 NAYS 7 |
2019-04-01 | House | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 04/03/19, 9:00 am, Sumner Hall |
2019-03-28 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2019-03-27 | House | CS by Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee read 1st time |
2019-03-27 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2019-03-26 | House | CS by Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 5 |
2019-03-22 | House | On Committee agenda-- Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee, 03/26/19, 8:00 am, 12 HOB |
2019-03-08 | House | Referred to Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee; State Affairs Committee |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-03-01 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
121 | 0511 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
121 | 055 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
125 | 66 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
162 | 12 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
166 | 041 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
189 | 015 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
190 | 005 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
194 | 037 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
197 | 402 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
200 | 065 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
316 | 066 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
338 | 223 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
373 | 0397 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
373 | 146 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 722 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
45 | 031 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
50 | 011 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
50 | 021 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
50 | 0211 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
50 | 031 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
50 | 0311 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
50 | 041 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
50 | 051 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
50 | 061 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
50 | 0711 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
501 | 059 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
69 | 081 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
712 | 06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
83 | 806 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
849 | 38 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
865 | 09 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
932 | 704 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |