FL H1225 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Removes requirement that airboats be equipped with masts or flagpoles bearing certain safety flags; prohibits operation & anchoring of vessels without masts or flagpoles bearing certain safety flags under specified conditions; provides penalties.
Title
Vessel Safety Flags
Sponsors
Rep. Thad Altman [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Died in Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee |
2022-03-12 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-12 | House | Now in Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to State Affairs Committee |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2022-01-06 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1546 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Environment and Natural Resources
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
327 | 391 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
327 | 50 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/1225 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/1225/BillText/Filed/PDF |