FL H1173 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Finance and Tax Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Requires Division of Bond Finance to review certain private activity bonds; exempts sales & leases to certain water utilities from sales tax; exempts from regulation person who resells water to certain entities;

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Water and Wastewater

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-28HouseDied in Finance and Tax Committee
2015-03-27HouseNow in Finance and Tax Committee
2015-03-26HouseCS by Energy and Utilities Subcommittee read 1st time
2015-03-26HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c)
2015-03-24HouseCS by Energy and Utilities Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 1
2015-03-20HouseOn Committee agenda-- Energy and Utilities Subcommittee, 03/24/15, 1:00 pm, Webster Hall
2015-03-08HouseReferred to Energy and Utilities Subcommittee; Finance and Tax Committee; Regulatory Affairs Committee
2015-03-03HouseIntroduced
2015-02-27HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S0776 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died in Appropriations

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1598105Amended CodeSee Bill Text
21208Amended CodeSee Bill Text
367022Amended CodeSee Bill Text
367081Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3670814Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3670816Amended CodeSee Bill Text
367084Amended CodeSee Bill Text
367111Amended CodeSee Bill Text
367171Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4031837Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4038532Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback