FL H1097 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires certain physicians to submit specified information to DOH to be exempt from specified licensure requirements; requires department to notify such health care practitioners of their exemption within specified timeframe.
Title
Health Care Licensure Requirements
Sponsors
Rep. Andrew Learned [D] | Rep. Kamia Brown [D] | Rep. Mike Caruso [R] | Rep. Sam Killebrew [R] |
Rep. Susan Valdes [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-15 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#152 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Professions & Public Health Subcommittee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Professions & Public Health Subcommittee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Senate | Died in Rules |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Received |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Rules |
2021-04-15 | Senate | In Messages |
2021-04-15 | House | Message sent to senate |
2021-04-15 | House | Immediately certified |
2021-04-15 | House | Passed; YEAS 118, NAYS 0 |
2021-04-15 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-15 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-08 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/15/2021) |
2021-03-24 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2021-03-24 | House | Bill released to House Calendar |
2021-03-24 | House | Reported out of Health & Human Services Committee |
2021-03-24 | House | Favorable by Health & Human Services Committee |
2021-03-22 | House | Added to Health & Human Services Committee agenda |
2021-03-16 | House | Now in Health & Human Services Committee |
2021-03-16 | House | Reported out of Professions & Public Health Subcommittee |
2021-03-16 | House | Favorable by Professions & Public Health Subcommittee |
2021-03-12 | House | Added to Professions & Public Health Subcommittee agenda |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-02-25 | House | Now in Professions & Public Health Subcommittee |
2021-02-25 | House | Referred to Health & Human Services Committee |
2021-02-25 | House | Referred to Professions & Public Health Subcommittee |
2021-02-17 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S780 (Same As) 2021-04-30 - Died in Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security