FL H1097 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) CS/SB 1398 passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) CS/SB 1398 passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides requirements for establishing quorum for meetings of certain councils when voting member appears via telephone, real-time videoconferencing, or similar real-time electronic or video communication.
Title
Regional Planning Council Meetings
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | House | Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) CS/SB 1398 passed |
2020-01-30 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-01-30 | House | Favorable by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 23 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-28 | House | On Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 01/30/20, 11:30 am, Morris Hall |
2020-01-21 | House | Now in State Affairs Committee |
2020-01-21 | House | Favorable by Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-16 | House | On Committee agenda-- Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee, 01/21/20, 9:00 am, 12 HOB |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2020-01-13 | House | Referred to Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee |
2020-01-06 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1398 (Same As) 2020-06-30 - Chapter No. 2020-122
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1097 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1097/BillText/Filed/PDF |