FL H1027 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Finance & Tax Council
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Finance & Tax Council
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides exemption from sales & use tax for sales of specified tangible personal property for specified period; provides exception for sales within public lodging establishment, theme park, entertainment complex, or airport; provides appropriation. APPROPRIATION: $315,905.
Title
Hurricane Preparedness
Sponsors
Rep. Erik Fresen [R] | Rep. Adam Hasner [R] | Rep. Doug Holder [R] | Rep. Scott Plakon [R] |
Rep. Robert Schenck [R] | Rep. John Tobia [R] | Rep. Baxter Troutman [R] | Rep. Trudi Williams [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Finance & Tax Council | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Finance & Tax Council; Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council -HJ 00092 | |
2010-02-25 | Referred to Finance & Tax Council; Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council | |
2010-02-12 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0158 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Military Affairs and Domestic Security