FL H1005 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Health Quality Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Health Quality Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes licensure requirements for certain foreign-trained physicians; authorizes Board of Medicine to certify applicant for licensure with restrictions, limitations, or conditions on certain foreign-trained physicians.
Title
Licensure of Internationally Trained Doctors
Sponsors
Rep. Daisy Baez [D] | Rep. John Cortes [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | House | Died in Health Quality Subcommittee |
2017-05-05 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced |
2017-03-01 | House | Referred to Health Quality Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2017-02-23 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0706 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Health Policy
S1546 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Health Policy
S1546 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Health Policy
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/1005 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/1005/BillText/Filed/PDF |