FL H0981 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires FTC to review sources of revenue for transportation infrastructure & maintenance projects & prepare report to Governor & Legislature, for submission by specified date, when FTC determines electric & hybrid vehicles make up certain percentage of registered vehicles; authorizes FTC, in consultation with DHSMV, to use certain data; requires FTC, in consultation with DEM, to assess transportation infrastructure with respect to emergency evacuations & electric vehicles; requires long-range transportation plan to consider infrastructure & improvements necessary to accommodate increased use of autonomous technology & electric vehicles.
Title
Electric and Hybrid Vehicles
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#683 (Y: 111 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | Senate | Died in Transportation |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Received |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Transportation; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations |
2018-03-01 | Senate | In Messages |
2018-03-01 | House | Passed; YEAS 111 NAYS 2 |
2018-03-01 | House | Read 3rd time |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2018-02-28 | House | Read 2nd time |
2018-02-22 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/28/18 |
2018-02-08 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-02-08 | House | Favorable by- Government Accountability Committee; YEAS 20 NAYS 0 |
2018-02-06 | House | On Committee agenda-- Government Accountability Committee, 02/08/18, 9:00 am, Morris Hall |
2018-01-30 | House | Now in Government Accountability Committee |
2018-01-29 | House | Favorable by Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 1 |
2018-01-25 | House | On Committee agenda-- Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee, 01/29/18, 3:00 pm, Reed Hall |
2018-01-09 | House | Now in Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee |
2018-01-09 | House | Favorable by Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced |
2018-01-05 | House | On Committee agenda-- Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee, 01/09/18, 1:00 pm, Reed Hall |
2017-12-20 | House | Referred to Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee; Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; Government Accountability Committee |
2017-12-12 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S384 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
S852 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar
S852 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar